RI H7720 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows individuals employed in domestic service or in or about a private home to be included as an employee, for purposes of minimum wages law.
Title
Minimum Wages
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. David Morales [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. Leonela Felix [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/16/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7720.pdf |