RI H7716 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Meeting postponed (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Meeting postponed (03/11/2020)
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines rifle and shotgun and makes it unlawful to possess a loaded rifle or shotgun in public subject to various exceptions.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
Rep. Grace Diaz [D] | Rep. Justine Caldwell [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Meeting postponed (03/11/2020) |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7716.pdf |