RI H7700 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-30 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a zoning board of review to hear and decide appeals within (65) days of filing. Requires a decision be rendered within (15) working days of the hearing and then recorded and filed in the office of the city or town clerk within (15) working days.
Title
Zoning Ordinances
Sponsors
Rep. John Desimone [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
Rep. Peter Palumbo [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 55 N: 1 NV: 19 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage (Y: 68 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-30 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-25 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | House | House passed Sub B in concurrence |
2014-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub B |
2014-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub B |
2014-06-16 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2014) |
2014-05-30 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-05-28 | House | House passed Sub A |
2014-05-22 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/28/2014) |
2014-05-22 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/22/2014) |
2014-03-13 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/13/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |