RI H7696 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance (would Rename The Rhode Island Insurers Insolvency Fund The Rhode Island Property & Casualty Insurance Guaranty Association And Would Amend The Chapter To Bring It Into Compliance With The Current Naic Model Act Upon Which The Statute Is Based)
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance (would Rename The Rhode Island Insurers Insolvency Fund The Rhode Island Property & Casualty Insurance Guaranty Association And Would Amend The Chapter To Bring It Into Compliance With The Current Naic Model Act Upon Which The Statute Is Based)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-14 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-08 | Senate passed Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-05-25 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-25 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence | |
2010-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-05 | Referred to Senate Corporations | |
2010-05-05 | House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-04-28 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-04-27 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-04-27 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-16 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-16 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7696.pdf |