RI H7685 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Promotes more diversity in the composition of the judicial nominating commission and would require that each list of qualified judicial candidates it submits to the governor for nomination include two (2) people of color.
Title
Courts -- Judicial Selection
Sponsors
Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Leonela Felix [D] | Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] |
Rep. David Morales [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/17/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7685.pdf |