RI H7681 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Make the use of a hand-held mobile phone while driving a commercial motor vehicle a traffic violation in accordance with federal regulations.
Title
Rhode Island Uniform Commercial Driver's License Act
Sponsors
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Samuel Azzinaro [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage recommit (Y: 12 N: 57 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage recommit (Y: 12 N: 57 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
House - Passage (Y: 59 N: 11 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-21 | House | Senate passed in concurrence |
2014-06-21 | House | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/20/2014) |
2014-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2014-06-14 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2014) |
2014-05-20 | House | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2014-05-14 | House | House read and passed |
2014-05-08 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/14/2014) |
2014-04-01 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/01/2014) |
2014-03-12 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/12/2014) |
2014-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |