RI H7678 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-20 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Unlawful Sexual Harassment In The Workplace (creates An Eleven (11) Member Special Legislative Commission To Study Unlawful Sexual Harassment In The Workplace And Reports Back To The House Of Representatives No Later Than May 17, 2018 And Whose Life Would Expire On June 7, 2018.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Unlawful Sexual Harassment In The Workplace (creates An Eleven (11) Member Special Legislative Commission To Study Unlawful Sexual Harassment In The Workplace And Reports Back To The House Of Representatives No Later Than May 17, 2018 And Whose Life Would Expire On June 7, 2018.)
Sponsors
Rep. Teresa Tanzi [D] | Rep. Nicholas Mattiello [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-20 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | House read and passed |
2018-03-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/20/2018) |
2018-03-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-03-09 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/15/2018) |
2018-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2018) |
2018-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |