RI H7665 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- APPOINTMENT, QUALIFICATION, AND TENURE OF OFFICERS - Requires letters of appointment of public officers and employees be sent to the secretary of state's office.
Title
Requires letters of appointment of public officers and employees be sent to the secretary of state's office.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |
Subjects
Public Officers And Employees
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- APPOINTMENT, QUALIFICATION, AND TENURE OF OFFICERS
PUBLIC OFFICERS AND EMPLOYEES -- APPOINTMENT, QUALIFICATION, AND TENURE OF OFFICERS
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7665.pdf |