RI H7658 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government & Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- SIZE, WEIGHT AND LOAD LIMITS -- WEIGHT RESTRICTIONS ON ROUTE 114 A EAST PROVIDENCE - Prohibits commercial motor trucks, with a gross weight rating of twenty-six thousand one pounds (26,001 lbs.) or more, from traveling on Route 114 A, East Providence between Pawtucket Avenue and the Massachusetts state line.
Title
Prohibits commercial motor trucks, with a gross weight rating of twenty-six thousand one pounds (26,001 lbs.) or more, from traveling on Route 114 A, East Providence between Pawtucket Avenue and the Massachusetts state line.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-29 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Subjects
Motor And Other Vehicles
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- SIZE, WEIGHT AND LOAD LIMITS
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- SIZE, WEIGHT AND LOAD LIMITS -- WEIGHT RESTRICTIONS ON ROUTE 114 A EAST PROVIDENCE
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- SIZE, WEIGHT AND LOAD LIMITS
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- SIZE, WEIGHT AND LOAD LIMITS -- WEIGHT RESTRICTIONS ON ROUTE 114 A EAST PROVIDENCE
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/HouseText24/H7658.pdf |