RI H7641 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Defeated in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-25 - Defeated in Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
members of the Rhode Island National Guard from Iraq.
Title
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-25 | Defeated in Committee | |
2010-05-25 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-18 | Committee continued | |
2010-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-11 | Committee continued | |
2010-05-11 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-25 | Introduced, referred to House Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7641.pdf |