RI H7630 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 11 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-16 - Referred to Senate Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- ACCIDENTS AND ACCIDENT REPORTS - Provides for a single, increased range of penalties for all driving offenses which result in serious bodily injury or death.
Title
Provides for a single, increased range of penalties for all driving offenses which result in serious bodily injury or death.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-11 - House - Passage (Y: 58 N: 11 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-16 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2024-04-11 | House | House read and passed |
2024-04-09 | House | Placed on House Calendar (04/11/2024) |
2024-04-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-04-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/09/2024) |
2024-03-21 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-03-15 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/21/2024) |
2024-02-15 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |