RI H7630 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employers from receiving any portion of the tips given by customers to their servers.
Title
Relating To Labor And Labor Relations – Tip Protection
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Aaron Regunberg [D] |
Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2016) |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7630.pdf |