RI H7630 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-20 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Regulation Of Vicious Dogs
Title
Regulation Of Vicious Dogs
Sponsors
Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] | Rep. Frank Ferri [D] |
Rep. Raymond Hull [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-20 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/20/2014) |
2014-02-26 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7630.pdf |