RI H7624 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes the unsolicited sending of goods unlawful and would regulate trial and introductory rate offers. Also makes violations of section unfair trade practices as defined in ยง6-13.1-1.
Title
Unsolicited Sending Of Goods
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2016) |
2016-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7624.pdf |