RI H7620 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifies the accumulated depreciation reduction by taking into account physical deterioration and obsolescence.
Title
Public Service Corporation Tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-01 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/05/2018) |
2018-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7620.pdf |