RI H7615 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/12/2020)
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/12/2020)
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the Rhode Island Community Resiliency and Preservation Act to provide cities and towns with the authority to propose, for consideration and decision by their voters, a reliable source of capital funding for investing in their community.
Title
Rhode Island Community Resiliency And Preservation Act
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Ruggiero [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] | Rep. Scott Slater [D] | Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (03/12/2020) |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2020-02-14 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7615.pdf |