RI H7612 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 14 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-22 - House passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits misrepresentation of an animal as a service animal. RI Commission for human rights to provide decals/signs and information to businesses. Penalty of $500 and/or 30 hours community service for violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Equal Rights Of Blind And Deaf Persons To Public Facilities

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-22 - House - Passage of amendment (Y: 64 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-22 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-22HouseHouse passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment)
2018-06-22HousePlaced on House Calendar (06/22/2018)
2018-06-22HouseCommittee recommends passage of Sub A
2018-06-22HouseScheduled for consideration (06/22/2018)
2018-03-28HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-20HouseMeeting postponed (03/21/2018)
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-03-06HouseMeeting postponed (03/07/2018)
2018-03-02HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-14HouseIntroduced, referred to House H.E.W.

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback