RI H7602 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Corporations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires businesses to be notified of any regulatory changes which materially impact the business.
Title
Business Notification Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joshua Giraldo [D] | Rep. David Place [R] | Rep. Karen Alzate [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2022) |
2022-03-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7602.pdf |