RI H7586 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renders most restrictive covenants in employment agreements with physicians void and unenforceable. Restrictive covenants in physician sales agreements for up to five years and those in unexpired employment agreements would be enforceable.
Title
Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Arthur Corvese [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-17 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 30 N: 6 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-08 - House - Passage (Y: 64 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-08 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/08/2016) |
2016-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-28 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2016) |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-03-08 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-02 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/08/2016) |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |