RI H7583 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-10 - Committee recommends passage in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
PUBLIC PROPERTY AND WORKS -- PUBLIC BUILDINGS - Allows the department of administration to temporarily loan the state battle flags and markers to approved federal or state agencies under the condition that such loan is insured by bond against damage or loss.
Title
Allows the department of administration to temporarily loan the state battle flags and markers to approved federal or state agencies under the condition that such loan is insured by bond against damage or loss.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/10/2024) |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2024-03-21 | House | House read and passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/21/2024) |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/14/2024) |
2024-02-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/29/2024) |
2024-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |