RI H7582 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-30 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits providers of online services to schools grade K-12 from using students' identifications to create profiles for any use other than school-related.
Title
Student Online Personal Information Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Joy Hearn [D] | Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] | Rep. Jared Nunes [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-24 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/30/2016) |
2016-02-11 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7582.pdf |