RI H7581 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires school districts to maintain classroom temperatures and humidity levels within targeted levels.
Title
School Funds And Property
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/11/2020) |
2020-02-13 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7581.pdf |