RI H7570 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
taskforce to recommend policies and procedures to improve accuracy of eyewitness identification.
Title
Sponsors
Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Donald Lally [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] |
Rep. Rice [?] | Rep. Michael Rice [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-10 | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-03 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-03 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-02 | Referred to Senate Judiciary | |
2010-06-01 | House passed Sub A | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-05-26 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-26 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-09 | Committee heard and continued | |
2010-03-09 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-24 | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/HouseText10/H7570.pdf |