RI H7562 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-02 - House passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Prospective Improvements In Patients' Accessibility To Medical Care From Licensed Naturopathic Physicians (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study Prospective Improvements In Patients' Accessibility To Medical Care From Licensed Naturopathic Physicians, And Would Report Back By April 20, 2023, And Would Expire On July 20, 2023.)
Title
House Resolution Creating A Special Legislative Commission To Study Prospective Improvements In Patients' Accessibility To Medical Care From Licensed Naturopathic Physicians (creates A 13 Member Commission To Study Prospective Improvements In Patients' Accessibility To Medical Care From Licensed Naturopathic Physicians, And Would Report Back By April 20, 2023, And Would Expire On July 20, 2023.)
Sponsors
Rep. Evan Shanley [D] | Rep. Robert Phillips [D] | Rep. Justin Price [R] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] |
Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Liana Cassar [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-02 - House - Passage (Y: 62 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-02 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-05-27 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-25 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-05-23 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-05-21 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/25/2022) |
2022-03-09 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2022) |
2022-02-18 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |