RI H7533 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Insurance - Nonprofit Hospital Service Corporations (would Set Forth The Circumstances & Procedures Whereby All Health Care Entities And Health Plans Would Be Required To Pay For Health Care Services If The Services Are Covered Under The Insurance Plan Or The Services Are Medically Necessary.)
Title
An Act Relating To Insurance - Nonprofit Hospital Service Corporations (would Set Forth The Circumstances & Procedures Whereby All Health Care Entities And Health Plans Would Be Required To Pay For Health Care Services If The Services Are Covered Under The Insurance Plan Or The Services Are Medically Necessary.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-07 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-20 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/07/2012) | |
2012-02-15 | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/HouseText12/H7533.pdf |