RI H7519 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-16 - House read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a process for the department of education collection and organization of information concerning the workload and scope of the duties and responsibility performed by school social workers.
Title
School Social Workers
Sponsors
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. David Bennett [D] |
Rep. Gregg Amore [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | House read and passed |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-15 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/15/2016) |
2016-03-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-16 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016) |
2016-02-10 | House | Introduced, referred to House H.E.W. |