RI H7508 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes an assault on taxi drivers a felony punishable by up to three (3) years imprisonment and an assault with a dangerous weapon punishable by five (5) to twenty (20) years imprisonment.
Title
Assaults
Sponsors
Rep. Ramon Perez [D] | Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] | Rep. Anastasia Williams [D] | Rep. Evan Shanley [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-04 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7508.pdf |