RI H7503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Defines "adult" as 18 years and older. Eliminates limitation on family court jurisdiction for cases of 17 year old children charged with specific serious crimes.
Title
Proceedings In Family Court
Sponsors
Rep. Carlos Tobon [D] | Rep. Shelby Maldonado [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Helder Cunha [D] |
Rep. Scott Slater [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-20 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | House read and passed |
2018-06-19 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-19 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2018-06-18 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-02-27 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2018) |
2018-02-08 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |