RI H7500 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 12 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-12 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Defines freestanding emergency care facilities subject to health care facilities licensing, emergency medical transportation, regulations and determination of need for new health care equipment and new institutional health services purposes.
Title
Licensing Of Health Care Facilities
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Daniel Mckiernan [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 23 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-12 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-18 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2016) |
2016-02-05 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |