CO SB131 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-26 - House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning prohibiting carrying a firearm in sensitive spaces recognized by the United States supreme court as places at which longstanding laws prohibited carrying firearms.
Title
Prohibiting Carrying Firearms in Sensitive Spaces
Sponsors
Sen. Sonya Jaquez Lewis [D] | Sen. Chris Kolker [D] | Rep. Kyle Brown [D] | Rep. Mandy Lindsay [D] |
Sen. Lisa Cutter [D] | Sen. Rhonda Fields [D] | Sen. Tom Sullivan [D] | Rep. Meg Froelich [D] |
Sen. Julie Gonzales [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.002) (Y: 18 N: 42 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 21 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-131 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-131 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.005) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.004) (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.003) (Y: 1 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.002) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.001) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-26 - House - House: Committee of the Whole Amd (h.001) (Y: 21 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2024-04-19 - House - House Appropriations: Refer Senate Bill 24-131 to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-17 - House - House Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-131 to the Committee on Appropriations. (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading Bill (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.005) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.004) (Y: 12 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.003) (Y: 1 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.002) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee of the Whole Cow * (s.001) (Y: 13 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Adopt amendment L.009 (Attachment B) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-27 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Refer Senate Bill 24-131, as amended, to the Committee of the Whole. (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-26 | House | House Second Reading Special Order - Passed with Amendments - Floor |
2024-04-22 | House | House Second Reading Laid Over Daily - No Amendments |
2024-04-19 | House | House Committee on Appropriations Refer Unamended to House Committee of the Whole |
2024-04-17 | House | House Committee on Judiciary Refer Unamended to Appropriations |
2024-04-05 | House | Introduced In House - Assigned to Judiciary |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Senate Third Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Senate Second Reading Passed - No Amendments |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Refer Amended to Senate Committee of the Whole |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee on Judiciary Witness Testimony and/or Committee Discussion Only |
2024-02-07 | Senate | Introduced In Senate - Assigned to Judiciary |