CA AB2930 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An act to add Chapter 25 (commencing with Section 22756) to Division 8 of the Business and Professions Code, relating to artificial intelligence.
Title
Automated decision tools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-23 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-16 - Assembly - Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. |
2024-04-24 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2.) (April 23). |
2024-04-23 | Assembly | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. |
2024-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time and amended. |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 3.) (April 16). |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | (Pending re-refer to Com. on JUD.) |
2024-04-18 | Assembly | Assembly Rule 56 suspended. |
2024-03-21 | Assembly | Referred to Coms. on P. & C.P. and JUD. |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | From printer. May be heard in committee March 17. |
2024-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. To print. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|
Business and Professions Code | 22756 | New Code | See Bill Text |