RI H7488 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes municipalities to adopt ordinances restricting vaping in public places and areas near schools, day care and hospitals.
Title
Ordinances
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. James Jackson [D] | Rep. James McLaughlin [D] | Rep. John Edwards [D] |
Rep. Terri-Denise Cortvriend [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7488.pdf |