RI H7471 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-03 - Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
MOTOR AND OTHER VEHICLES -- OPERATORS' AND CHAUFFEURS' LICENSES - Amends several provisions relative to motorcycles and motor scooter license and educational requirements including deleting the learners permit requirement for motorcycles.
Title
Amends several provisions relative to motorcycles and motor scooter license and educational requirements including deleting the learners permit requirement for motorcycles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-21 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-03 | Senate | Referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
2024-03-21 | House | House read and passed |
2024-03-15 | House | Placed on House Calendar (03/21/2024) |
2024-03-14 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/14/2024) |
2024-02-29 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-23 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/29/2024) |
2024-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |