RI H7455 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
In real estate recognize an enhanced life estate which empowers the grantor who reserved a life estate to sell, convey, mortgage or dispose of real estate without the consent of the holder of the remainder interest
Title
Relating To Property
Sponsors
Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. Scott Guthrie [D] |
Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2014) |
2014-02-12 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7455.pdf |