RI H7442 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates an exception in the revolving-door rule in the code of ethics.
Title
Code Of Ethics
Sponsors
Rep. Blake Filippi [R] | Rep. Robert Nardolillo [R] | Rep. Michael Chippendale [R] | Rep. Robert Lancia [R] |
Rep. Sherry Roberts [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2016) |
2016-02-03 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7442.pdf |