RI H7423 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 8 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-08 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Replaces requirement that the notice for the final canvass and correction of voter registration files be posted in a newspaper with the requirement that the notice for the final canvass to be published on the official website maintained by the city/town.
Title
Canvassing The Lists Of Qualified Electors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-31 - Senate - Passage (Y: 33 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-08 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2022-05-31 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-05-31 | Senate | Senate passed in concurrence |
2022-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/31/2022) |
2022-05-17 | House | House read and passed |
2022-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2022) |
2022-05-10 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-05-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2022) |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/24/2022) |
2022-02-09 | House | Introduced, referred to House State Government & Elections |