RI H7412 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on July 13 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-13 - Vetoed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Makes refusing to compensate a claimant for loss of use of a rental vehicle an unfair claims practice.
Title
Unfair Claims Settlement Practices Act
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Palangio [D] | Rep. Jean Barros [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Helio Melo [D] |
Rep. Thomas Winfield [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage (Y: 43 N: 11 NV: 20 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-13 | House | Vetoed by Governor |
2016-07-07 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-17 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2016) |
2016-01-29 | House | Introduced, referred to House Corporations |