RI H7406 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-03 - Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-03 - Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Defines confidential information and prohibits the intentional and unauthorized access to another's computer, computer system or network with the intent to view, save or copy confidential information contained therein.
Title
Computer Crime
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. John Carnevale [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Rep. Stephen Ucci [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-03 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/14/2016) |
2016-05-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-13 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-02-23 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-18 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2016) |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7406.pdf |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7406A.pdf |