RI H7396 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Eliminates bond requirements in civil forfeiture cases and allows petitioner to request court to reduce or eliminate forfeiture amount.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2016) |
2016-01-28 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7396.pdf |