RI H7387 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Establishes procedures to notify individuals of any breaches of their unencrypted personal information and penalties for any violation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Breach Of Personal Information Notification Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseWithdrawn at sponsor's request
2018-03-23HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/28/2018)
2018-03-20HouseMeeting postponed (03/21/2018)
2018-03-16HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration
2018-02-01HouseIntroduced, referred to House Judiciary

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback