RI H7384 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-11 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expands the definition of "employee" to add any individual employed in a food service establishment, which would include a caterer licensed by the department of health and division of taxation, and a food truck.
Title
Relating To Holidays And Days Of Special Observance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2020-03-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (03/11/2020) |
2020-03-04 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/04/2020) |
2020-01-30 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/HouseText20/H7384.pdf |