RI H7377 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-05-25 - Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2018)
Pending: House Labor Committee
Hearing: May 31 House Labor Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relieves municipal police bargaining representatives from their obligation to represent employees in grievances/arbitrations if they were not members of the bargaining unit within the ninety (90) days prior to the events that caused the grievance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Municipal Police Arbitration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-25HouseScheduled for consideration (05/31/2018)
2018-03-01HouseCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2018-02-19HouseScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018)
2018-01-31HouseIntroduced, referred to House Labor

Subjects


Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback