RI H7377 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Relieves municipal police and firefighter bargaining representatives from their obligation to represent employees in grievances/arbitrations if they were not members of the bargaining unit within the 90 days prior to the events that caused the grievance.
Title
Municipal Police And Firefighters' Arbitration
Sponsors
Rep. Hagan McEntee [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Dennis Canario [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] |
Rep. Joseph Almeida [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-21 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - House - Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | House | Signed by Governor |
2018-07-02 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/21/2018) |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2018-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Referred to Senate Labor |
2018-06-05 | House | House passed Sub A |
2018-06-01 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/05/2018) |
2018-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-05-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2018) |
2018-03-01 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Labor |