RI H7357 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-02 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Add the enterprise zone tax credit to the list of tax credits available to the taxpayers in computing tax liability under this chapter
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Rep. Raymond Johnston [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. William San Bento [D] | Rep. Patrick O'Neil [D] |
Rep. Mary Messier [D] | Rep. Elaine Coderre [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/02/2014) |
2014-02-06 | House | Introduced, referred to House Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/HouseText14/H7357.pdf |