RI H7351 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-09 - Committee recommends passage
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that the town of Bristol would be authorized to exempt from taxation, or otherwise enter into payment in lieu of tax agreements regarding property in the town of Bristol of qualifying nonprofit, charitable organizations.
Title
Property Subject To Taxation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-09 | House | Committee recommends passage |
2022-06-03 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/09/2022) |
2022-02-16 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/16/2022) |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7351.pdf |