RI H7345 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a two (2) year pilot program to provide insurance coverage for neurofeedback therapy for members of the military and veterans suffering from post-traumatic stress disorder and for individuals under the age of twenty-one (21).
Title
Neurofeedback Therapy
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Noret [D] | Rep. Julie Casimiro [D] | Rep. Katherine Kazarian [D] | Rep. Joseph McNamara [D] |
Rep. Camille Vella-Wilkinson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/14/2022) |
2022-02-04 | House | Introduced, referred to House Health & Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText22/HouseText22/H7345.pdf |