RI H7341 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits declawing on a cat or other animal, unless a licensed veterinarian has determined that the procedure is necessary for a therapeutic purpose. Any person who violates this section would be subject to a fine of not more than $1,000.
Title
Cruelty To Animals
Sponsors
Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Charlene Lima [D] | Rep. Joseph Solomon [D] | Rep. Deborah Fellela [D] |
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-19 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-01-31 | House | Committee transferred to House H.E.W. |
2018-01-31 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/HouseText18/H7341.pdf |