RI H7336 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-16 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Increases awardable attorneys' fees in adjudicatory proceedings from one hundred twenty-five dollars ($125) to one hundred fifty dollars ($150) per hour.
Title
Equal Access To Justice For Small Businesses And Individuals
Sponsors
Rep. Christopher Blazejewski [D] | Rep. Cale Keable [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] |
Rep. Eileen Naughton [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-08 - Senate - Passage in concurrence (Y: 33 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-17 - House - Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-16 | House | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-06-08 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-08 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/08/2016) |
2016-05-24 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-05-20 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2016-05-17 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-05-13 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/17/2016) |
2016-05-10 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-06 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/10/2016) |
2016-03-02 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/02/2016) |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |