RI H7324 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-03 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: House Environment and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes changes to and clarify the definition of what constitutes unlawful confinement of a "covered animal" and would apply them throughout the chapter accordingly.
Title
Animal Care
Sponsors
Rep. Patricia Serpa [D] | Rep. Robert Craven [D] | Rep. William O'Brien [D] | Rep. Joseph Shekarchi [D] |
Rep. Charlene Lima [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-03 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-02-26 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/03/2016) |
2016-01-27 | House | Introduced, referred to House Environment and Natural Resources |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/HouseText16/H7324.pdf |