RI H7310 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the division of vital statistics to provide an original birth certificate of an adult adopted person to the adopted person's lineal descendants or the legal representative of the adopted person if the adopted person is deceased.
Title
Vital Records -- Adoption Of Children
Sponsors
Rep. Maryann Shallcross-Smith [D] | Rep. Edith Ajello [D] | Rep. Mia Ackerman [D] | Rep. Kathleen Fogarty [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-04 - House - Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor |
2022-06-24 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-23 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (06/23/2022) |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2022-06-17 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/21/2022) |
2022-06-02 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2022) |
2022-05-20 | Senate | Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2022-05-04 | House | House passed Sub A |
2022-04-29 | House | Placed on House Calendar (05/04/2022) |
2022-04-27 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2022-04-22 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-22 | House | Scheduled for consideration (04/27/2022) |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/13/2022) |
2022-04-08 | House | Proposed Substitute |
2022-04-13 | House | Committee postponed at request of sponsor (04/13/2022) |
2022-04-08 | House | Scheduled for consideration |
2022-02-17 | House | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/17/2022) |
2022-02-02 | House | Introduced, referred to House Judiciary |